Price, Jeffrey James (CPSO#: 59404)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 258-4335
Fax: (519) 258-8718
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey J. Price Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Price ( CPSO# 59404 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 258-4335

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY JAMES PRICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRICE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1989