Price-Jones, Robert Gregory (CPSO#: 58578)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
62 Colborne Street East
Orillia ON  L3V 1T6
Phone: (705) 326-5852
Fax: (705) 326-8401
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Greg Price-Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Price-Jones ( CPSO# 58578 )

Business Address:
62 Colborne Street East
Orillia ON  L3V 1T6
Phone Number: (705) 326-5852

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 04 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT GREGORY PRICE-JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRICE-JONES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1991