Pritchett, Sean Byron (CPSO#: 80821)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
114 St Paul Street
Belleville ON  K8N 0E1
Phone: (613) 968-6969
Fax: (613) 968-6995
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean Pritchett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pritchett ( CPSO# 80821 )

Business Address:
114 St. Paul Street
Belleville ON  K8N 0E1
Phone Number: (613) 968-6969

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN BYRON PRITCHETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRITCHETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008