Prutis-Misterska, Krystyna Beata (CPSO#: 57594)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Polish, Russian

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M1
Phone: (416) 652-6101
Fax: (416) 652-1994
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Krystyna Prutis-Misterska Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Prutis-Misterska ( CPSO# 57594 )

Business Address:
Dufferin Health Centre
1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M2
Phone Number: (416) 652-6101

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 31 Aug 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRYSTYNA BEATA PRUTIS-MISTERSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRUTIS-MISTERSKA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1993