Przysiezny, Janine Marie (CPSO#: 73497)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: Robertson, Janine Marie (used until: 08 Nov 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 637-0511
Fax: (519) 631-6497
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Przysiezny Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Przysiezny ( CPSO# 73497 )

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 637-0511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Jul 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANINE MARIE PRZYSIEZNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRZYSIEZNY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 20 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2005