Psarakis, Stella (CPSO#: 56859)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1418 Ontario Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1G4
Phone: (905) 681-2344
Fax: (905) 681-2297
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stella Psarakis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Psarakis ( CPSO# 56859 )

Business Address:
1418 Ontario Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1G4
Phone Number: (905) 681-2344

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STELLA PSARAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PSARAKIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Dec 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1987