Pugh, Debra Marilyn (CPSO#: 76134)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road PO Box 209
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 75354
Fax: (613) 737-8688
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pugh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pugh ( CPSO# 76134 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
PO Box 209
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8948

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBRA MARILYN PUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005