Pun, Christine Wing-Hung (CPSO#: 76863)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James T. O. Chau and Dr. Christine W. Pun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chau ( CPSO# 73662 )
Dr. C. Pun ( CPSO# 76863 )

Business Address:
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2
Phone Number: (705) 848-7181

Business Address:
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Unit D
Sudbury ON  P3A 2T4
Phone Number: (705) 688-3970

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 675-4700

Business Address:
680 Kirkwood Drive
Suite 3
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone Number: (705) 675-5900

Business Address:
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 746-4540

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jul 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE WING-HUNG PUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2013 to 28 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2001