Pun, Cynthia (CPSO#: 86651)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkdale Queen West Community
Health Centre (Queen West site)
168
Toronto ON  M5V 2R4
Phone: 4167038480
Fax: (416) 703-8479
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1466 Bathurst Street
Suite 306
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Canada
Phone: (416) 536-5555
Fax: (416) 536-3352
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cynthia Pun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pun ( CPSO# 86651 )

Business Address:
Suite 306
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 536-5555

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA PUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009