Punthakee, Zubin Dinshaw (CPSO#: 72253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
Department Of Medicine
Room 3V51
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 22820
Fax: (905) 521-4971
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zubin Punthakee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Punthakee ( CPSO# 72253 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
HSC 3V51 - 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZUBIN DINSHAW PUNTHAKEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUNTHAKEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2004 to 28 Nov 2004
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Nov 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2005