Pytyck, Jennifer Monique (CPSO#: 86485)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Shores Centre
For Mental Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 430-4055
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer M. Pytyck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pytyck ( CPSO# 86485 )

Business Address:
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
Suite 7-2
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone Number: (905) 430-4055

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MONIQUE PYTYCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PYTYCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2013