Qazi, Khalida (CPSO#: 87117)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pushto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Holly Medical Clinic
Suite 103
611 Holly Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 0K4
Phone: (905) 878-0086
Fax: (905) 878-1562
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khalida Qazi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Qazi ( CPSO# 87117 )

Business Address:
103 - 611 Holly Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 0K4
Phone Number: (905) 878-0086

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHALIDA QAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QAZI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009