Qian Lee, Ivy Hai-Ping (CPSO#: 79359)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Dalhousie University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 408
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-5733
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Qian Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Qian Lee ( CPSO# 79359 )

Business Address:
Suite 408
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-5733

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IVY HAI-PING QIAN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QIAN LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 15 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 16 Oct 2006 to 15 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 16 Oct 2007 to 15 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2008