Queen, Martin (CPSO#: 51719)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Laboratory Office
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 675-4779
Fax: (705) 675-4780
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bonin and Queen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ngae ( CPSO# 94283 )
Dr. B. Mitrovic ( CPSO# 91572 )
Dr. Z. Saeed Kamil ( CPSO# 91326 )
Dr. J. Gonzalez Berjon ( CPSO# 102034)
Dr. L. Widjanarko ( CPSO# 51679 )
Dr. A. Tomczak-Bojarski ( CPSO# 73304 )
Dr. M. Rutherford ( CPSO# 67926 )
Dr. M. Queen ( CPSO# 51719 )
Dr. R. McClure ( CPSO# 101763)
Dr. S. Gaytan-Garcia Graham ( CPSO# 60547 )
Dr. D. Bonin ( CPSO# 58373 )
Dr. M. Bonin ( CPSO# 58383 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 674-3181


Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Queen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Queen ( CPSO# 51719 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Laboratory Office
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 675-4779

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN QUEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUEEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1984 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1988