Quinn, Brendan Patrick (CPSO#: 54552)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1355 Bank Street
Suite 502
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone: (613) 738-1584
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brendan Quinn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Quinn ( CPSO# 54552 )

Business Address:
Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone Number: (613) 738-1835

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDAN PATRICK QUINN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUINN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1986