Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Quinn, Gerard (CPSO#: 58168)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
222 Fairview Dr Unit 205
Brantford ON  N3R 2W9
Phone: (519) 752-0346
Fax: (519) 752-7608
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gerard Quinn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Quinn ( CPSO# 58168 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
222 Fairview Drive
Brantford ON  N3R 2W9
Phone Number: (519) 752-0346

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERARD QUINN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUINN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1988