Rachakonda, Ramanamurthy Venkatappiah (CPSO#: 81839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Aug 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Telugu

Education:Gujarat University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
P O Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 5489
Fax: 519-749-4378
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachakonda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rachakonda ( CPSO# 81839 )

Business Address:
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-7300

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 01 Mar 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
International Specialist Physician - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 23 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 28 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 28 Aug 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Apr 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Ramanamurthy Venkatappiah Rachakonda may practise medicine independently in
            radiation oncology, only.