Raco, Lina Clementina (CPSO#: 66675)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 20B
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P2
Phone: (519) 747-1200
Fax: (519) 747-1560
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lina Raco Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Raco ( CPSO# 66675 )

Business Address:
Unit 20B
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P2
Phone Number: (519) 747-1200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINA CLEMENTINA RACO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RACO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1995