Raghubir, Kushal Vinod (CPSO#: 68491)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3447 Kennedy Road
Suite 215
Scarborough ON  M1V 3S1
Phone: (416) 335-9804
Fax: (416) 335-9805
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Birchmount Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2886
Fax: (416) 495-2538
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.V. Raghubir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Raghubir ( CPSO# 68491 )

Business Address:
3447 Kennedy Road
Suite 215
Scarborough ON  M1V 3S1
Phone Number: (416) 335-9804

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KUSHAL VINOD RAGHUBIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAGHUBIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1996