Rahim, Sherali Akber (CPSO#: 77715)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oshawa Clinic
4th Floor
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-6151
Fax: (905) 721-6670
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sherali A. Rahim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rahim ( CPSO# 77715 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Clinic
4th Floor Tower
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-6151

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 19 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERALI AKBER RAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2006