Rainkie, Kristopher Dana (CPSO#: 80967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111 Ext. 4228
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lasik Cataract Centre
39 Commerce Rd
Lindsay ON  K9V 5Y3
Canada
Phone: (705) 320-8080
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kristopher Rainkie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Rainkie ( CPSO# 80967 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Business Address:
39 Commerce Road
Lindsay ON  K9V 5Y3
Phone Number: (705) 320-8001

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTOPHER DANA RAINKIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAINKIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2007