Raja, Faisal Siddique (CPSO#: 74724)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Faisal Raja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Abbasi ( CPSO# 89840 )
Dr. F. Raja ( CPSO# 74724 )

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAISAL SIDDIQUE RAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 01 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Aug 2010 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Aug 2011 to 01 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2002