Rajan, Poonam (CPSO#: 71057)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 319-1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 502-1000
Fax: (416) 502-1030
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 306-1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 487-3453
Fax: (416) 487-5528
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Rajan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rajan ( CPSO# 71057 )

Business Address:
Suite 306
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 487-3453

Business Address:
Suite 319
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 502-1000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. POONAM RAJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 May 1997 to 13 Jun 1997
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 05 Jun 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 May 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2001