Rajani, Priya Kantilal (CPSO#: 74687)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Appleby College Medical
540 Lakeshore Road West
Oakville ON  L6K 3P1
Phone: (905) 845-1544
Fax: (905) 845-2024
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barakat Rajani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Barakat ( CPSO# 73539 )
Dr. P. Rajani ( CPSO# 74687 )

Business Address:
Appleby College Medical
540 Lakeshore Road West
Oakville ON  L6K 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 845-1544

Business Address:
Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Outpatient Mental Health
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRIYA KANTILAL RAJANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2002