Rajaratnam, Krishan (CPSO#: 69242)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
M5
414 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8
Phone: (905) 526-8430
Fax: (905) 526-6227
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Krishan Rajaratnam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Rajaratnam ( CPSO# 69242 )
Dr. S. Martiniuk ( CPSO# 69205 )

Business Address:
414 Victoria Avenue North
Suite M5
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 526-8430

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Grand Cayman

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISHAN RAJARATNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJARATNAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2001