Rajchgot, Jason Michael (CPSO#: 103765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Donnelly Wing
4-054D
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Percy Rajchgot Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rajchgot ( CPSO# 103765)
Dr. P. Rajchgot ( CPSO# 29165 )

Business Address:
2100 Finch Avenue West
Suite 202B
Downsview ON  M3N 2Z9
Phone Number: (416) 665-8515

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON MICHAEL RAJCHGOT shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. RAJCHGOT is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. RAJCHGOT shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RAJCHGOT is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. RAJCHGOT shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. RAJCHGOT is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. RAJCHGOT no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018