Ram, Katherine (CPSO#: 82713)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health & Wellness
Koffler Student Services Centre
University of Toronto
214 College Street, Main Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Phone: 416-978-8030
Fax: (416) 978-7341
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rm 3240, 3rd Floor
100 Stokes Street
Bell Gateway Building
CAMH
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Canada
Phone: 416-535-8501 Ext. 30985
Fax: 416-595-6821
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE RAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2010