Ramachandran, Sanjay (CPSO#: 68780)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
125 Lakeview Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 3T6
Phone: (613) 384-4664
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ramachandran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ramachandran ( CPSO# 68780 )

Business Address:
Reddendale Family Health Centre
125 Lakeview Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 3T6
Phone Number: (613) 384-4664

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJAY RAMACHANDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMACHANDRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1997