Ramji, Shaffiq (CPSO#: 60990)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
108-790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 921-2121
Fax: 416-929-7316
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shaffiq Ramji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ramji ( CPSO# 60990 )

Business Address:
108-790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 921-2121

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: PO Box 38279 Upanga Dar es Salaam, Tanzania
Date Received: 15 Dec 2009


Address: Patients to send their written requests to: Dr. Ramji Aga Khan University Hospital Department of Family Medicine P.O. Box 2289 Ocean Road, Dar es Salaam Tanzania
Date Received: 15 Mar 2007

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAFFIQ RAMJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMJI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1990