Ramsaywak, Peggy Clare (CPSO#: 84531)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Walkers & New Medical Associates
495 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7N 2E3
Phone: (905) 634-9292
Fax: (905) 681-7274
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Ramsaywak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ramsaywak ( CPSO# 84531 )

Business Address:
Walkers & New Medical Associates
495 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7N 2E3
Phone Number: (905) 634-9292

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PEGGY CLARE RAMSAYWAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMSAYWAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2008