Ramzan, Sarah (CPSO#: 97923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Urdu

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jane and Finch FHT
136A
1 Yorkgate Blvd
Toronto ON  M3N 3A1
Phone: (416) 745-4555
Fax: (416) 745-0786
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

8865 Yonge St Unit B6
Toronto ON  L4C 6Z1
Canada
Phone: (905) 763-2001
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Ramzan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ramzan ( CPSO# 97923 )

Business Address:
136A - 1 York Gate Boulevard
Toronto ON  M3N 3A1

Business Address:
8865 Yonge Street
Unit B6
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 6Z1
Phone Number: (905) 763-2001

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH RAMZAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMZAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014