Rana, Shreyas Kanu (CPSO#: 94440)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Sep 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Spartan Health Sciences University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
130 HWY 20 EAST
UNIT A6
Fonthill ON  L3B 0B3
Phone: (905) 892-1010
Fax: (905) 892-4004
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

130 Hwy 20 East
Unit A6
Fonthill ON  L0S 1E0
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois
USA - New York
USA - Wisconsin

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 22 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Shreyas Kanu Rana may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.