Rang, Louise Clare Felicity (CPSO#: 69876)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Kingston Health Sciences Center
Kingston General Site
76 Stuart St, Kingston ON
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: 613 549 6666 Ext. 4975
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston Health Sciences Center
Hotel Dieu Site
166 Brock St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 2368
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Louise C.F. Rang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Rang ( CPSO# 69876 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUISE CLARE FELICITY RANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001