Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Rao, Pramila (CPSO#: 51465)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Andhra University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 470
63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone: (807) 344-8475
Fax: (807) 344-6323
Electoral District: 09
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakehead Rehabilitation Centre
St Joseph's General Hospital
P O Box 3251
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Canada
Phone: (807) 345-0510
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Rao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rao ( CPSO# 51465 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Medical Centre
470 - 63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone Number: (807) 344-8475

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRAMILA RAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1994