Raphy, Pascale (CPSO#: 76920)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Ext. 2777
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pascale Raphy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Raphy ( CPSO# 76920 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PASCALE RAPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2001 to 21 Sep 2001
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 08 Jul 2002 to 27 Sep 2002
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2005