Rappaport, Daniel Charles (CPSO#: 57413)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Ext. 33569
Fax: (416) 747-3610
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DC Rappaport Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rappaport ( CPSO# 57413 )

Business Address:
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL CHARLES RAPPAPORT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPPAPORT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1987