Rasoulinejad, Parham (CPSO#: 86285)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Science Centre
First Floor, E1-311
800 Commissioners Rd. E.
London, Ontario N6A 4G5
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55360
Fax: (519) 685-8059
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rasoulinejad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rasoulinejad ( CPSO# 86285 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
4th Floor, Westminster Tower
Suite E4002
London ON  N6A 4G5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PARHAM RASOULINEJAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASOULINEJAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2012