Rassouli, Seyed Alipasha (CPSO#: 86655)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 10th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 1S4
Phone: (519) 371-1008
Fax: 226-277-0888
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 102
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Canada
Phone: 647 345 2444
Fax: 647 345 2445
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

9080 Yonge Street
Level 2
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Canada
Phone: (289)597-7676
Fax: 289)597-7675
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rassouli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rassouli ( CPSO# 86655 )

Business Address:
102 - 1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (647) 345-2444

Business Address:
250 10th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 1S4
Phone Number: (519) 371-5769

Business Address:
12 - 9080 Yonge Street
Level 2
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone Number: (289) 597-7676

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEYED ALIPASHA RASSOULI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASSOULI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2013 to 01 Mar 2013
Elective Trainee - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014