Rassouli-Rashti, Mohammad (CPSO#: 76131)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 4450
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Rassouli-Rashti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rassouli-Rashti ( CPSO# 76131 )

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  May 5, 2012
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On July 26, 2012, Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre notified the College that Dr. Rassouli-Rashti’s on-call privileges and privileges to provide in-patient consultations were temporarily suspended, effective May 15, 2012.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD RASSOULI-RASHTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASSOULI-RASHTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Nov 2004
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2005
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2009
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 12 Apr 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2016

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Oct 2008
Summary:

 On October 20, 2008, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. RassouliRashti committed professional 
 misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional; and that he engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician.

 On 
 February 13, 2009, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	The Registrar suspend 
 Dr. RassouliRashti(s educational certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months 
 starting March 13, 2009, two months of which shall be suspended if Dr. RassouliRashti completes, 
 at his own expense, the College(s Medical Ethics course and provides proof thereof to the College. 
 

2.	Dr. RassouliRashti attend before the panel to be reprimanded and that the reprimand be 
 recorded in the Register. 

3.	Dr. RassouliRashti pay costs of the hearing in the amount of 
 $5,000, within twelve months of the date of this order. 
 

On March 11, 2009, Dr. RassouliRashti 
 filed a Notice of Appeal of the decision to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court).  
 Pursuant to ss.25(1) of the Statutory Powers Procedure Act, the decision of the Discipline 
 Committee is stayed pending the outcome of the appeal.

On November 10, 2009, the Divisional Court 
 dismissed the appeal.  Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee is in effect.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 10 Nov 2009
Hearing Date(s): Jun 17, 2008