Rasul, Imran Asheque (CPSO#: 70398)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Medical Arts Center
Suite 415
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 607-8340
Fax: (905) 607-7229
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West GTA Endoscopy
2225 Erin Mills Parkway Suite
Suit3 183
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Canada
Phone: (905) 823-0223
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Imran A. Rasul Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Rasul ( CPSO# 70398 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4466

Business Address:
Credit Valley Medical Arts Center
415 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 607-8340

Business Address:
West GTA Endoscopy
Sheridan Centre
Unit 183
2225 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Phone Number: (905) 823-0223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Nov 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IMRAN ASHEQUE RASUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASUL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000