Ravindran, Nikila Comondore (CPSO#: 82976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 10
2563 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON  L6A 2E8
Phone: 905-553-3382
Fax: 905-553-3313
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health
(Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital)
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905-883-2310
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 14 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIKILA COMONDORE RAVINDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVINDRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009