Ray, Dalia (CPSO#: 31916)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 May 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Nagpur University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bathurst Medical Building
4256 Bathurst Street
Suite 300
Downsview ON  M3H 5Y8
Phone: (416) 631-7545
Fax: (416) 631-6455
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dalia Ray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ray ( CPSO# 31916 )

Business Address:
Bathurst Medical Building
300 - 4256 Bathurst Street
Downsview ON  M3H 5Y8
Phone Number: (416) 631-7545

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 04 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 May 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 09 May 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 09 May 2016 Active View Details [+]

            As from May 9, 2016,  the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Dalia Ray, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Ray to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                       UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                       DR. DALIA RAY ("Dr. Ray")
                                                  to
                   THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (the "College")

            A.    PREAMBLE

                  1.    I, Dr. Ray, certificate of registration number 31916, am a member
                        of the College.
                  
                  2.    I,  Dr.  Ray,  acknowledge  that  on  April  13,  2011,  the
                        Inquiries,  Complaints  and Resolutions  Committee  (ICRC)  ordered
                        me  to  complete  a  Specified  Continuing Education and
                        Remediation Plan ("SCERP"), attached hereto at Appendix "A".
                  
                  3.    I, Dr. Ray, acknowledge that under the SCERP, I was ordered to have
                        a reassessment of my practice by an assessor selected by the
                        College.
                  
                  4.    I, Dr. Ray, acknowledge that an Assessor conducted a reassessment
                        of my practice for the College. The Assessor's reports are dated
                        September 7, 2014 and October 1, 2014.
                  
            B.    UNDERTAKING

                  5.    I, Dr. Ray, understand and agree that I am bound by the terms of
                        this Undertaking from the date on which I sign it.
                  
                  6.    Reassessment of Practice
                  
                        (a)   I, Dr. Ray, undertake that, approximately six (6) months from
                              the date I execute this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                              reassessment of my practice (the "Reassessment") by an
                              assessor or assessors selected by the College (the
                              "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and agree that the
                              reassessment will include a chart review, direct observation
                              of my care, and may include interviews with me, and/or my
                              colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any
                              other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                        (b)   I, Dr. Ray, understand and agree that the Assessor(s) will:
                  
                              (i)   meet with me for one half-day to directly observe my
                                    office practice, including patient care and
                                    documentation; and
                  
                              (ii)  meet with me for one half-day for an interview with me,
                                    including discussion of 15-25 randomly selected charts.
                  
                  7.    I, Dr. Ray, undertake to co-operate fully with the reassessment of
                        my practice conducted under the terms of this Undertaking, and to
                        abide by the recommendations of the Assessor(s).
                  
                  8.    Monitoring
                  
                        (a)   I, Dr. Ray, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and
                              not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice
                              Locations and patient records by a College representative for
                              the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the terms of
                              this Undertaking.
                  
                        (b)   I, Dr. Ray, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                              make appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance
                              Plan and/or any person or institution that may have relevant
                              information, in order for the College to monitor my
                              compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

                  9.    I, Dr. Ray, undertake to comply with the terms and conditions of
                        this Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any term of
                        this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct
                        and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified
                        allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.
                  
                  10.   I, Dr. Ray, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                        payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from
                        the implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking.
                  
                  11.   I, Dr. Ray, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                        the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I
                        have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing
                        this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

                  12.   I,  Dr.  Ray,  give  my  irrevocable  consent  to  the  College  to
                        provide  the  following information to all Assessors, or  Chief of
                        Staff of my practice location:
                  
                        (a)   Any information the College has that led to the circumstances
                              of my entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                        (b)   Any  information  arising  from  any  investigation  into,
                              or  assessment  of,  my practice; and
                  
                        (c)   Any  information  arising  from  the  monitoring  of  my
                              compliance  with  this Undertaking.
                  
                  13.   I, Dr. Ray, give my irrevocable consent to all Assessor(s), to
                        disclose to the College, and e another, any information:
                  
                        (a)   Relevant to this Undertaking; and
                  
                        (b)   Relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with
                              this Undertaking.
                  
                  14.   I, Dr. Ray, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                        terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of
                        registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Health
                        Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated
                        Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended.  I
                        understand that this Undertaking shall be information on the
                        College's Register that is available to the public during the time
                        period that the Undertaking remains in effect.