Razvi, Hassan (CPSO#: 61423)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6259
Fax: (519) 646-6037
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marignani Razvi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Razvi ( CPSO# 61423 )
Dr. M. Marignani ( CPSO# 62132 )

Business Address:
272 Oxford Street West
London ON  N6H 1S9
Phone Number: (519) 438-1130

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
Room B4-658
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6259

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 29 Aug 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HASSAN RAZVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1991