Read, Dale (CPSO#: 105259)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: Robertson, Dale (used until: 09 Aug 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kirkland & District Family Health
2 Water Lane
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3M6
Phone: (705) 567-2224
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centre de Sante du Temiskaming
22 water lane
Kirkland Lake ON  P2M 3M6
Canada
Phone: 705 567 1414
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

Extendicare Kirkland Lake
155 government rd East
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3P4
Canada
Phone: 705 567 3268
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

Kikrland and District Hospital
145 Government Rd W
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 2E8
Canada
Phone: (705) 567-5251
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dale Read Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Read ( CPSO# 105259)

Business Address:
Kirkland & District Family Health
2 Water Lane
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3M6
Phone Number: (514) 608-4974

Business Address:
145 Government Road East
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3P4
Phone Number: (705) 567-5251

Business Address:
22 Water Lane
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 2S8
Phone Number: (705) 567-1414

Business Address:
155 Government Road West
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 2E8
Phone Number: (705) 567-3268

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Feb 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALE READ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. READ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 12 Jan 2015 to 08 Feb 2015
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2015