Reaume, John Kenneth (CPSO#: 59518)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
525 Dublin Street
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2L3
Phone: (519) 323-0255
Fax: (519) 323-2113
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Reaume Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Reaume ( CPSO# 59518 )

Business Address:
Clair Stewart Medical Clinic
525 Dublin Street
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2L3
Phone Number: (519) 323-0255

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Sep 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN KENNETH REAUME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REAUME is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1989