Rebel, Margaretha (CPSO#: 55398)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Dec 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Center
L H S C-E3-638
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 646-6103
Fax: (519) 646-6324
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Margaretha Rebel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rebel ( CPSO# 55398 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
E3-638
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 646-6103

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARETHA REBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REBEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1990