Redlick, Fara Paige (CPSO#: 79458)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingsway Dermatology
1243 Islington Avenue
Suite 1000
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone: (416) 231-0100
Fax: (416) 231-0109
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Compass Dermatology
650 Mt Pleasant ave
Toronto ON  M4S 2N5
Canada
Phone: (647) 351-9277
Fax: 647-351-9077
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fara Redlick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Redlick ( CPSO# 79458 )

Business Address:
Kingsway Dermatology
Suite 1000
1243 Islington Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone Number: (416) 231-0100

Business Address:
Suite 8
650 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto ON  M4S 2N5
Phone Number: (647) 351-9277

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARA PAIGE REDLICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDLICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2008