Redpath, Calum Jon (CPSO#: 87517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Jan 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Heart Inst
Department of Electrophysiology
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696 7000
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Calum Redpath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Redpath ( CPSO# 87517 )
Dr. S. Redpath ( CPSO# 87500 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institution
Department of Electrophysiology
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7271


Corporation Name: Stephanie Redpath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Redpath ( CPSO# 87517 )
Dr. S. Redpath ( CPSO# 87500 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Neonatology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 27 Jan 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2007 to 29 Aug 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 Jan 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Oct 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Calum Jon Redpath may practise medicine independently in cardiology.