Redstone, Carol Sylvia (CPSO#: 70043)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2310
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROL SYLVIA REDSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDSTONE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 18 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2000 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2001