Reedijk, Michael Jan (CPSO#: 69241)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Room 3-130
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4432
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Reedijk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Reedijk ( CPSO# 69241 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
Room 3-130
610 University Aveue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4432

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 12 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAN REEDIJK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REEDIJK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 04 Nov 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 05 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 04 Nov 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 05 Nov 1997 to 04 Nov 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 05 Nov 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 10 Jan 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2000 to 04 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2001